HILLSBOROUGH ARENA SPORTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1126206
Charity reporting is up to date (52 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 March 2021 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 March 2021 52 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 15 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 10 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 27 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 23 January 2017 On time Download