THE ELMHURST FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1126479
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 05 April 2019 21 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 21 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 21 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 16 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 16 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 01 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 01 December 2016 On time Download