Accounts and annual returns LEEDS SIKH WELFARE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1127884
Charity reporting is overdue by 133 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 133 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 133 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required