JAMAICA SCHOOL RESOURCES

Charity number: 1126488
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 August 2020 03 June 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 August 2019 18 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 August 2018 18 May 2020 352 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 August 2017 31 July 2018 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 August 2016 16 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2016 Not Required