JAMAICA SCHOOL RESOURCES

Charity number: 1126488
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/08/2016 01/08/2017 01/08/2018 01/08/2019 01/08/2020
Total gross income £663 £1.04k £500 £500 £550
Total expenditure £500 £500 £300 £600 £500
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A