Accounts and annual returns ROCK FOUNDATION UK LIMITED

Charity number: 1126626
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 12 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 04 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window