Financial history ROCK FOUNDATION UK LIMITED

Charity number: 1126626
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £448.51k £499.51k £716.30k £991.84k £723.64k
Total expenditure £395.64k £456.73k £606.67k £717.74k £593.49k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £75.26k £9.36k N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £406.64k £734.97k £573.39k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £309.66k £168.50k £54.43k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £88.38k £95.42k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £606.67k £717.74k £593.49k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £5.66k £3.20k £1.71k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0