SOUTH AFRICAN YOUTH EDUCATION FOR SUSTAINABILITY LTD

Charity number: 1127701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 16 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 04 July 2017 On time Download