SOUTH AFRICAN YOUTH EDUCATION FOR SUSTAINABILITY LTD

Charity number: 1127701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £64.80k £100.36k £34.80k £31.20k £33.80k
Total expenditure £63.37k £100.97k £56.26k £24.81k £38.96k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A