THE FRIENDS OF TREBORTH BOTANIC GARDEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's volunteers carry out most of the management of the Botanic Garden, including gardening, plant records and woodland management. We show visitors around the Garden and arrange gardening and botanical training courses, walks and garden visits. We arrange concerts and other entertainments at the Garden and hold plants sales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gwynedd
Governance
- 29 September 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH LANE EDGAR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Natalie Jayne Chivers | Trustee | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor John Anthony Parkinson | Trustee | 02 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Jane Shaw | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anthony John Howard MBE | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.41k | £23.20k | £22.97k | £24.36k | £27.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.00k | £19.33k | £34.94k | £22.53k | £21.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.04k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 23 June 2023 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 08 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 23 June 2021 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 MAY 2007.
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROMOTE, OR ASSIST IN PROMOTING, THE CONSERVATION, MAINTENANCE AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE GROUNDS AND GARDENS AND MONUMENTS THEREIN AT THE UNIVERSITY OF WALES BANGOR BOTANIC GARDEN, TREBORTH, BANGOR, GWYNEDD. 3.2 TO ADVANCE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE OF THE GROUNDS AND GARDENS, PARTICULARLY BY PROMOTING CULTURAL AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES, ON BEHALF OF MEMBERS OF THE FRIENDS OF TREBORTH BOTANIC GARDEN, SCHOOLS, COLLEGES, ADULT GROUPS AND MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC. 3.3 TO PRESERVE, ENCOURAGE, SUPPORT AND ENHANCE THE SCIENTIFIC VALUE OF THE LIVING PLANT COLLECTIONS IN THE GROUNDS AND GARDENS, THE HABITAT THEY OFFER FOR INDIGENOUS WILDLIFE AND THEIR ENVIRONMENTAL IMPORTANCE IN THE AREA.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
BANGOR UNIVERSITY
TREBORTH BOTANIC GARDEN
TREBORTH
BANGOR
LL57 2RQ
- Phone:
- 01248353398
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window