Financial history THE PARACHUTE REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION LONDON BRANCH

Charity number: 1126315
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £12.41k £10.84k £10.61k £4.01k £57
Total expenditure £14.98k £8.18k £13.85k £6.27k £499
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A