MALARIA NO MORE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 1126222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.03m £2.25m £2.93m £2.53m £4.22m
Total expenditure £1.93m £2.56m £2.92m £2.45m £3.41m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.94m £1.97m £374.89k £622.03k £1.06m
Income - Other trading activities £75.76k £275.00k £386.52k £303.79k £5.54k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £2.17m £1.61m £3.15m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £10.96k £6.53k £2.68k £2.09k £1.91k
Income - Other £4.24k £0 £0 £0 £155
Income - Legacies £10.76k £1.20k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.82m £2.43m £2.72m £2.15m £3.06m
Expenditure - Raising funds £113.33k £131.90k £201.84k £297.76k £356.82k
Expenditure - Governance £3.88k £28.20k £511.37k £0 £36.85k
Expenditure - Grants institution £160.69k £299.70k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0