MALARIA NO MORE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 1126222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Eva Thorne Norman Trustee 28 April 2020 None on record
Sophie O'Connor Trustee 28 February 2020
CHANCE TO SHINE FOUNDATION LTD Received: On time
Philip Thomas Trustee 01 January 2015 None on record
David Anthony Reddy Trustee 30 April 2019 None on record
Professor Azra Ghani Trustee 01 September 2017 None on record
Norman Bloe Mbazima Trustee 28 February 2020 None on record
Simon James Robert Bland Trustee 21 October 2015 None on record
Rt Hon Baroness Helene Hayman Chair 23 February 2019 None on record
ANDREW COOK Trustee 01 June 2017 None on record
Dr LINDA YUEH Trustee 01 June 2017
COUTTS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION Received: On time
ST EDMUND HALL IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD Received: On time
ROYAL COMMONWEALTH SOCIETY Received: On time