Accounts and annual returns NK AND BEYOND MISSIONS INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1126908
Charity reporting is overdue by 15 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 15 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 15 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 31 May 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 06 September 2022 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window