NK AND BEYOND MISSIONS INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1126908
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £31.45k £25.29k £24.74k £18.07k £28.00k
Total expenditure £33.53k £26.60k £28.05k £17.71k £18.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A