Financial history ST JOHN'S FOUNDATION PORTHCAWL

Charity number: 1126671
Charity reporting is overdue by 160 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £48 £0 £1.15k £276 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £1.13k £55 £58
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A