THE FRANCIS WILDLIFE CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1126090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £753 £532 £6.00k £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £2.30k £12.00k £300 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A