POSITIVE START (ROSSENDALE) LIMITED

Charity number: 1126416
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £4.45k £14.85k £7.56k £7.06k £6.54k
Total expenditure £3.31k £31.20k £14.76k £11.86k £10.17k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A