CHILD'S - I FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1126212
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £620.33k £558.64k £1.08m £994.23k £1.10m
Total expenditure £623.58k £541.47k £934.98k £987.48k £1.12m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £150.59k £262.18k
Income - Donations and legacies £557.07k £506.99k £1.08m £994.23k £1.10m
Income - Other trading activities £62.10k £51.52k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £960 £132 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £203 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £3.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £536.40k £455.71k £885.14k £968.37k £1.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £85.75k £49.84k £19.12k £93.06k
Expenditure - Governance £14.39k £14.22k £0 £26.14k £46.28k
Expenditure - Grants institution £111.24k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0