CHILD'S - I FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1126212
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Beate Sorum Trustee 13 March 2018 None on record
Debbie Elizabeth Clarke Trustee 15 August 2019
BRITISH TRIATHLON FOUNDATION TRUST Received: On time
THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE FOR SECURITIES AND INVESTMENT Received: On time
Adesola Olumide Adetosoye OBE Trustee 11 November 2020 None on record
SSekindi Victoria Bakulumpagi Trustee 28 January 2020 None on record
MADELEINE GRAHAM HARDING Chair 18 November 2011
THE TONY AND SHEELAGH WILLIAMS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION Received: On time
Joel Kibazo Trustee 18 July 2019
ONE WORLD MEDIA TRUST Received: On time
EDUCATION SUB-SAHARAN AFRICA Received: On time
SERIOUS TRUST LIMITED
THE MVULE TRUST Received: On time
THE ROYAL AFRICAN SOCIETY Received: On time
SIMON NICHOLAS GOODWORTH Trustee 03 September 2012 None on record