THE JIM CRONIN MEMORIAL FUND FOR PRIMATE WELFARE AND CONSERVATION

Charity number: 1126939
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 February 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 February 2021 2 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2017 11 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 11 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 29 February 2016 21 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2016 21 December 2016 On time Download