THE JIM CRONIN MEMORIAL FUND FOR PRIMATE WELFARE AND CONSERVATION

Charity number: 1126939
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 29/02/2016 28/02/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £708.68k £389.41k £760.96k £447.12k £579.92k
Total expenditure £341.07k £387.98k £528.78k £431.88k £467.06k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £562.99k N/A £477.60k N/A £392.86k
Income - Other trading activities £21.22k N/A £107.67k N/A £153.91k
Income - Charitable activities £123.07k N/A £175.69k N/A £21.99k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £1.41k N/A £0 N/A £11.18k
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies £475.16k N/A £359.28k N/A £252.97k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £164.07k N/A £421.95k N/A £140.88k
Expenditure - Raising funds £47.21k N/A £106.83k N/A £66.77k
Expenditure - Governance £88.47k N/A £6.77k N/A £3.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £129.79k N/A £0 N/A £259.41k