Financial history THAMES WATER TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1126714
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £889.40k £672.27k £654.82k £450.18k £865.51k
Total expenditure £667.85k £713.40k £947.77k £908.90k £343.71k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £889.33k £672.00k £654.00k N/A £865.38k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £75 £271 £817 N/A £128
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £667.85k £713.40k £947.77k N/A £343.71k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £4.03k £2.40k £0 N/A £2.68k
Expenditure - Grants institution £277.92k £309.52k £524.58k N/A £292.69k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0