MOXAFRICA

Charity number: 1128408
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 27 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 24 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 28 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 29 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2015 29 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)