ST. ANNE'S COMMUNITY HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provision of rooms to lease or hire to those living within our area of benefit firstly, and secondly to the wider community to provide social and educational activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,550 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Essex
Governance
- 07 October 2008: Standard registration
- ST ANNE'S COMMUNITY HALL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Spindler | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Sommers | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Smith | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
COUNCILLOR GAIK CHOON CHUAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACQUELINE ELIZABETH BOWIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COUNCILLOR MICHAEL JOHN HOGG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.32k | £47.08k | £78.36k | £85.14k | £97.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.12k | £70.46k | £67.57k | £72.58k | £88.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £16.33k | N/A | £10.00k | £3.55k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 FEBRUARY 2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME 29 MARCH 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ST. ANNE'S POLITICAL WARD AND ST. ANNE'S PARISH WARD AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY, WITHOUT DISTINCTION ON GROUNDS OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, SOCIAL WELFARE, ADVICE AND EDUCATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
OAK TREE CENTRE
252 HARWICH ROAD
COLCHESTER
CO4 3DH
- Phone:
- 01206865864
- Email:
- mikehogg99@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window