BRISTOL CONCERT ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1128196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £25.89k £23.09k £22.05k £27.74k £14.98k
Total expenditure £24.37k £23.51k £21.49k £25.27k £19.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A