BRISTOL CONCERT ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1128196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANDREW COOMBS Trustee None on record
Dr Andrew George Weir Lawrie MEng PhD Trustee 17 November 2020 None on record
ANDREW REES Trustee None on record
Dr Michael Anthony Lea-Wilson Trustee 15 October 2018 None on record
OSIAN THOMAS LUKE MINEUR Trustee 17 December 2017 None on record
MIKE ORGAN Trustee None on record
BRENDA MARY STACEY Chair 13 October 2014 None on record
WENDY LEWIS Trustee None on record
Dr Samantha Jayne Roome PhD, BSc Trustee 21 October 2019 None on record