Financial history HUMAN RELIEF FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1126281
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £6.53m £6.11m £8.16m £9.50m £10.22m
Total expenditure £5.95m £5.56m £7.98m £8.42m £9.30m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.99m £4.62m £7.28m £6.67m £6.63m
Income - Other trading activities £466.27k £408.27k £429.65k £347.09k £432.75k
Income - Charitable activities £2.06m £1.07m £450.40k £2.48m £3.15m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £47 £321 £614 £275 £32
Income - Other £7.35k £7.61k £8.09k £5.92k £7.04k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.58m £4.32m £6.71m £7.15m £7.91m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.18m £1.24m £1.27m £1.26m £1.39m
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £188.18k £0 £0 £0 £0