DAGENHAM ISLAMIC WELFARE ASSOCIATION & MOSQUE

Charity number: 1129870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £55.95k £56.27k £66.53k £114.14k £85.71k
Total expenditure £50.23k £51.30k £55.04k £72.94k £67.59k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A