Trustees HERNE BAY PIER TRUST

Charity number: 1128253
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jacqueline White Trustee 30 July 2020
None on record
Simon Craig Welsh Trustee 30 July 2020
None on record
Lynn Faux-Bowyer Trustee 28 February 2020
None on record
Linda Hackwith Trustee 27 November 2019
None on record
Susan Pearl Halfpenny Trustee 06 November 2019
None on record
Linda Blake Trustee 20 August 2019
None on record
David Townsend Trustee 24 February 2015
None on record