THE STANMORE AND CANONS PARK SYNAGOGUE ERUV COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintain and operate an eruv in the Stanmore and Canons Park area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Barnet
- Harrow
Governance
- 02 December 2008: Standard registration
- STANMORE ERUV (Working name)
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR NIGEL DE KARE SILVER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JEFFREY GINSBERG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN STEPHEN BRIGGS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.00k | £8.88k | £6.26k | £9.09k | £7.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.82k | £6.20k | £6.13k | £5.14k | £6.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 JULY 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 27 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH PARTICULARLY IN THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF HARROW AND BARNET AND IN PARTICULAR BY PROMOTING SABBATH OBSERVANCE AMONGST ADHERENTS OF THAT FAITH, BY: 1 THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF AN ERUV; AND 2 PROMOTION OF ORTHODOX JEWISH TEACHING CONCERNING OBSERVANCE OF THE SABBATH
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGHS OF HARROW AND BARNET
Contact information
- Address:
-
121 STONEGROVE
EDGWARE
HA8 7TJ
- Phone:
- 02089053400
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window