Accounts and annual returns THE MARK SPEIGHT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1128085
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 Overdue Overdue by 183 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Overdue Overdue by 183 days
Annual return 29 February 2020 Overdue Overdue by 547 days
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Overdue Overdue by 547 days
Annual return 28 February 2019 Overdue Overdue by 914 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Overdue Overdue by 914 days
Annual return 28 February 2018 03 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 03 December 2018 On time
Annual return 28 February 2017 26 January 2018 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required