Financial history COUNCIL FOR LEARNING OUTSIDE THE CLASSROOM

Charity number: 1127802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £271.46k £186.73k £226.22k £131.56k £223.21k
Total expenditure £312.10k £214.66k £215.38k £140.37k £116.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A