PEOPLE TREE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1126532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 January 2021 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 April 2020 172 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 07 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 07 October 2016 On time Download