Accounts and annual returns BRODETSKY SCHOOLS LIMITED

Charity number: 1127210
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 02 October 2022 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 October 2022 459 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 18 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 01 August 2019 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 01 August 2019 32 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 11 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 11 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window