Financial history BRODETSKY SCHOOLS LIMITED

Charity number: 1127210
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £171.67k £37.71k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £257.59k £38.71k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A