NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES UK LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education of the public in relation to scientific matters, in particular by supporting the New York Academy of Sciences in such ways and in such manner as shall be exclusively Charitable and such other exclusively charitable purposes as the Trustees of the Charity may in their absolute discretion determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- City Of London
- United States
Governance
- 10 December 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Dirks | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Giancarlo Bonagura | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jerry Hultin | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Pompidou | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.00k | £4.32k | £5.11k | £5.71k | £7.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.91k | £5.76k | £5.34k | £7.48k | £12.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 01 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 18 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 AUGUST 2008
Charitable objects
A THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN RELATION TO SCIENTIFIC MATTERS, IN PARTICULAR BY SUPPORTING THE NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH MANNER AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE; AND B SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE. THIS CLAUSE MAY NOT BE AMENDED WITHOUT THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 WORLD TRADE CENTER
250 GREENWICH STREET
NEW YORK, NY
- Phone:
- 2122988600
- Email:
- smurray@nyas.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window