MUIN WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1127233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 22 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 February 2019 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 February 2019 22 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 November 2017 On time Download