MUIN WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1127233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £98.57k £200.12k £130.39k £37.43k £115.95k
Total expenditure £76.19k £124.44k £138.45k £101.08k £114.65k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A