Accounts and annual returns CHARITABLE GIVING

Charity number: 1128013
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 18 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 18 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 03 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 03 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 03 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 03 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2018 15 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 15 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2017 20 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 20 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window