Financial history CHARITABLE GIVING

Charity number: 1128013
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £422.24k £443.56k £463.55k £459.15k £434.06k
Total expenditure £400.17k £417.36k £400.48k £399.33k £403.71k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £11.08k