Accounts and annual returns IVCC

Charity number: 1128437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2022 25 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 25 April 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 06 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 06 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 06 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 06 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 12 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 12 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 31 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 31 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window