Financial history IVCC

Charity number: 1128437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £28.77m £39.64m £38.58m £39.44m £48.61m
Total expenditure £28.86m £36.21m £37.08m £38.21m £47.47m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.79m £9.56m £8.80m £8.19m £5.94m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £28.71m £35.99m £37.34m £39.21m £48.48m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £60.00k £220.00k £558.00k £226.00k £129.00k
Income - Other £0 £3.43m £678.00k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £28.77m £36.21m £37.08m £38.21m £47.47m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £161.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £21.67m £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £91.00k £0 £0 £0 £0