IVCC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The IVCC is a Product Development Partnership (PDP) established as a not for profit company and registered charity to overcome the barriers to innovation in the development of new insecticides for public health vector control and to develop information systems and tools which will enable new and existing pesticides to be used more effectively.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£33,436,000
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £33.05m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £383.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£32,333,000
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £32.33m | |
Other | £0 |
-£61,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £5,242,000 from 1 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £32.33m | |
Retained for future use | £1.10m |
People

24 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 3 |
£80k to £90k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Camden
- Liverpool City
- Australia
- Benin
- Burkina Faso
- Canada
- China
- Denmark
- France
- Germany
- Ghana
- Greece
- Ireland
- Israel
- Ivory Coast
- Japan
- Kenya
- Madagascar
- Mali
- Mexico
- Mozambique
- Netherlands
- Norway
- Rwanda
- Senegal
- Singapore
- South Africa
- Spain
- Switzerland
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- Uganda
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- Vietnam
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 05 March 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sherwin Charles | Chair | 04 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Charles Smith | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jacqueline Applegate | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ray Nishimoto | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Philip Andrew Welkhoff | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Russell | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keziah Laurencai Malm | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Keziah Laurencai Malm | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Schofield | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Elizabeth Chizema | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alan Court | Trustee | 13 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.64m | £38.58m | £39.44m | £48.61m | £33.44m | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.21m | £37.08m | £38.21m | £47.47m | £32.33m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.24m | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.56m | £8.80m | £8.19m | £5.94m | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £35.99m | £37.34m | £39.21m | £48.48m | £33.05m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £220.00k | £558.00k | £226.00k | £129.00k | £383.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £3.43m | £678.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £36.21m | £37.08m | £38.21m | £47.47m | £32.33m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £61.43m | £44.69m | £46.70m | £32.78m | £24.24m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £56.65m | £37.92m | £38.70m | £22.89m | £13.19m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 12 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 12 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 FEBRUARY 2009 as amended on 19 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY ALLEVIATING AND PREVENTING THE SPREAD OF ANY TYPE OF TROPICAL DISEASE WHICH IS NOW OR MAY HEREAFTER BECOME KNOWN IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHERE SUCH DISEASE EITHER MANIFESTS ITSELF OR HAS EFFECTS BY ANY MEANS, AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY: 3.1 STIMULATING INDUSTRY AND ACADEMIA TO DISCOVER, DEVELOP AND DELIVER NEW TOOLS TO BETTER MANAGE INSECTS WHICH TRANSMIT DISEASE AND TO MONITOR AND BETTER DIRECT THE USE OF THESE TOOLS. 3.2 PROMOTING AND ENCOURAGING THE DISSEMINATION OF NEW SCIENTIFIC INFORMATION. 3.3 ENSURING THE PRODUCTS AND SYSTEMS DEVELOPED ARE ACCESSIBLE TO THOSE IN NEED OF THEM IN THE DEVELOPING COUNTRIES OF THE WORLD. 3.4 PROMOTING AND CONDUCTING RESEARCH INTO ISSUES CONCERNING PUBLIC HEALTH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
SCHOOL OF TROPICAL MEDICINE
PEMBROKE PLACE
LIVERPOOL
L3 5QA
- Phone:
- 01517053265
- Email:
- david.worrall@lstmed.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window