Trustees IVCC

Charity number: 1128437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sherwin Charles Chair 04 December 2018
None on record
Ray Nishimoto Trustee 13 July 2023
None on record
Dr Philip Andrew Welkhoff Trustee 22 March 2023
None on record
Susan Russell Trustee 16 February 2023
None on record
Keziah Laurencai Malm Trustee 24 September 2021
None on record
Dr Keziah Laurencai Malm Trustee 24 September 2021
None on record
Jonathan Schofield Trustee 01 January 2020
WIRRAL YOUTH ZONE
Received: On time
Dr Elizabeth Chizema Trustee 05 December 2019
None on record
Alan Court Trustee 13 December 2017
None on record
Jeremy Lefroy Trustee 01 December 2016
STAFFORD WORKS
Received: On time
Global Coalition for Youth Employment
Received: On time
Community Foundation for Staffordshire and Shropshire
Received: On time
THE TRAIDCRAFT FOUNDATION
Received: 99 days late
FRIENDS OF THE GUILDHALL, NEWCASTLE UNDER LYME
Received: On time
CAFE AFRICA TRUST
Received: On time
THE YARLET TRUST
Received: On time
THE DONALD MACKAY TRUST
Received: On time
THE MYCRO TRUST
Overdue by 103 days
THE BUCKE COLLINS CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
Received: On time
TANZANIA DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
THE RELATIONSHIPS FOUNDATION
Received: 3 days late
STAFFORD AND DISTRICT CARERS HOLIDAY TRUST
Received: On time
CONCORDIS INTERNATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
STAFFORDSHIRE HISTORY DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time