KEA PRE SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity Number: 1127048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The main activities of the charity are the carrying on of a pre school, out of hours club and holiday club for boys and girls and the doing of all such other things as are incidental or conductive to the attainment of that object.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £284,779
Total expenditure: £277,028

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 December 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stuart Pearson Chair
CORNWALL MUSIC FESTIVAL
Received: 17 days late
DAVID CLEWLOW Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £185.89k £190.24k £224.19k £256.50k £284.78k
Total expenditure £197.78k £175.15k £231.53k £242.70k £277.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £114.29k £154.21k
Income from government grants £9.90k N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 01 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 01 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 10 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 29 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 February 2023 102 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 10 February 2023 102 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
KEA PRESCHOOL
KEA
TRURO
TR3 6AY
Phone:
01872 260299