SOLID ROCK DELIVERANCE BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1128232
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £29.78k £25.10k £35.67k £36.95k £25.28k
Total expenditure £32.03k £28.26k £40.42k £29.55k £8.30k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A