THE SPRINGFIELD PROJECT

Charity number: 1134977
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hannah Christine Greenwood Trustee 04 December 2020 None on record
Gregor Leslie Moss Trustee 06 February 2014 None on record
Dr ANDREAS MICHAEL MELCHIOR Trustee 10 February 2012 None on record
Rev Thomas Thomas Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CHRISTOPHER'S SPRINGFIELD Received: On time
Fiona Cross-Sudworth Trustee 04 February 2019 None on record
ALISON ROPER-HALL Trustee 03 March 2014
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CHRISTOPHER'S SPRINGFIELD Received: On time
Timothy Boyes Trustee 04 December 2020 None on record
CAROLINE LOUISE MINCHIN Trustee None on record
Peter John Hunt Trustee 09 May 2016 None on record