YEMENI DEVELOPMENT AND RESEARCH NETWORK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
During the year, the charity arranged collecting donations from Medical graduates in UK in the form of second-hand medical text books. Total of 33 text books (not older than 3 years) have been collected. The whole process is cost free. Thank to a generous people who volunteer for collecting and to delivering the text books.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 November 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Yemen
Governance
- 13 August 2009: Standard registration
- 14 June 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/11/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 November 2010 | 17 May 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 MAY 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 26 JUNE 2009
Charitable objects
(I) THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN YEMEN RESULTING FROM POVERTY, FAMINE, WAR, NATURAL DISASTER OR OTHER PUBLIC CALAMITY, (II) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN YEMEN. (III) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT. (IV) THE PROMOTION OF HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: = MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; = RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES, IN PARTICULAR AS THEY AFFECT WOMEN AND CHILDREN; = RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; (V) TO PROMOTE AND CARRY OUT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT RESEARCH AND TO PUBLISH OR OTHERWISE DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. (VI) THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; (VII) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG ASYLUM SEEKERS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR IN YEMEN BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE AND SUPPORT, (VIII) TO ADVANCE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM OR IN YEMEN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window