YPL (YOUNG PEOPLE LITTLEPORT)

Charity number: 1127679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 November 2020 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 November 2020 5 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 February 2020 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

17 February 2020 109 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 August 2019 303 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 August 2019 303 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 August 2018 287 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 August 2018 287 days late Download